This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 21:15:53 (UTC).

Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P. vs. County of Fresno

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Sprint Telephony PCS, L P filed an Other lawsuit against County of Fresno. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3215

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.

Defendants

County of Fresno

The State Board of Equalization

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boersch, Martha A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Cover Sheet - Fresno - Sprint PCS-signed.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Notice Filed

11/22/21 - Notice Re Deadline and Request to Cont.; Comment: Re Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147 and Request to Continue

Order Received for Signature

11/22/21 - Proposed Order Cont CMC; Comment: **order signed and processed on 11/30/21** Forwarded to Dept: 403 Order for: Additional Time / Cont CMC

Order Granted

11/30/21 Order Granted; Cont Deadlines/CMC; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order Continuing Case Deadlines; CMC on 2/23/22 cont to 12/6/22

Complaint - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

10/28/2021: Complaint - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

Cover Sheet - Fresno - Sprint PCS-signed.pdf

10/28/2021: Cover Sheet - Fresno - Sprint PCS-signed.pdf

Summons - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

10/29/2021: Summons - Fresno - Sprint.pdf

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

10/29/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

11/22/21 - Notice Re Deadline and Request to Cont.

11/22/2021: 11/22/21 - Notice Re Deadline and Request to Cont.

11/22/21 - Proposed Order Cont CMC

11/22/2021: 11/22/21 - Proposed Order Cont CMC

11/30/21 Order Granted; Cont Deadlines/CMC

11/30/2021: 11/30/21 Order Granted; Cont Deadlines/CMC

3/24/2022 Request for Dismissal

03/24/2022: 3/24/2022 Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.; County of Fresno; The State Board of Equalization; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order Continuing Case Deadlines; CMC on 2/23/22 cont to 12/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-75078 Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: **order signed and processed on 11/30/21** Forwarded to Dept: 403 Order for: Additional Time / Cont CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Re Statutory Deadline to Serve Complaint Under Revenue and Taxation Code Section 5147 and Request to Continue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-68631 Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Sprint Telephony PCS, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boersch, Martha A