This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 12:59:28 (UTC).

Southern California Gas Company vs. Leo Gonzales

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Southern California Gas Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Leo Gonzales. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9343

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern California Gas Company

Defendants

Gonzales, Leo

Bernal, Silvano N.

SBN Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levy, Nazila Y.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

12/14/21 Complaint

Summons issued and filed

12/14/21 Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference; Comment: CMC set for Tuesday, 04/26/2022 at 3:30 p.m. in Department 402.

12/14/21 Complaint

12/14/2021: 12/14/21 Complaint

12/14/21 Summons

12/17/2021: 12/14/21 Summons

CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

12/17/2021: CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

2-16-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/16/2022: 2-16-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/22 Minute Order Attachment

04/26/2022: 4/26/22 Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Southern California Gas Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-79766 Southern California Gas Company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Southern California Gas Company: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Southern California Gas Company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for Tuesday, 04/26/2022 at 3:30 p.m. in Department 402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant