This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 19:54:01 (UTC).

Song Kim vs. Nicole De Sousa

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Song Kim filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nicole De Sousa. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1910

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim, Song Lee

Cross Defendants and Defendants

GSF Properties, Inc.

Thayer, Deidre

De Sousa, Nicole

Sierra Ridge

GSF Sierra Ridge Clovis Investors, L.P.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Thayer, Deidre

De Sousa, Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Farzam, Joseph S

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Czeshinski, Michael J.

Lozano, Claudia

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Lozano, Claudia

 

Court Documents

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Deposit

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

04/05/2022: Minute Order Attachment

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

12/17/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

12/17/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

12/17/2021: CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185

211216_Notice of Settlement-Kim.pdf

12/17/2021: 211216_Notice of Settlement-Kim.pdf

Notice

06/09/2021: Notice

210225_Stipulation re ADR pdf.pdf

02/25/2021: 210225_Stipulation re ADR pdf.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

01/08/2021: Minute Order Attachment

4130542_725CMCStmtwi

12/28/2020: 4130542_725CMCStmtwi

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Estimated 5-6 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed; Comment: Treated as an Unconditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kim, Song Lee: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-47036 Kim, Song Lee $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kim, Song Lee: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Kim, Song Lee; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 11/12/20 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GSF PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZAM, JOSEPH S