This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 12:14:15 (UTC).

Slavic Tsytsyn vs. Iceberg Pools, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Slavic Tsytsyn filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Iceberg Pools, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1495

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Negin, Stephanie

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

Tsytsyn, Slavic

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Iceberg Pools, Inc.

AJ&T Plumbing & Electric, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alfieris, Steven

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Pinion, G. Bryan

 

Court Documents

5-16-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/16/2022: 5-16-22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

5-16-22 Complaint

05/16/2022: 5-16-22 Complaint

5-18-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/18/2022: 5-18-22 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

5-20-22 First Amended Complaint

05/20/2022: 5-20-22 First Amended Complaint

5-24-22 Summons

05/20/2022: 5-24-22 Summons

6/8/22 Proof of Service

06/08/2022: 6/8/22 Proof of Service

6/8/22 Proof of Service

06/08/2022: 6/8/22 Proof of Service

7/7/22 General Denial

07/07/2022: 7/7/22 General Denial

7/07/22 Cross Action/Cross Complaint

07/07/2022: 7/07/22 Cross Action/Cross Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AJ&T Plumbing & Electric, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-42414 AJ&T Plumbing & Electric, Inc. $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for AJ&T Plumbing & Electric, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: AJ&T Plumbing & Electric, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $870.00; Total Payments and Credits $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tsytsyn, Slavic: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-30298 Tsytsyn, Slavic $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tsytsyn, Slavic: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Tsytsyn, Slavic; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINION, G BRYAN