This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 15:58:16 (UTC).

Sheina Rosas vs. Mounib Dakhil

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Sheina Rosas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mounib Dakhil. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3029

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosas, Sheina

Defendants

Dakhil, Mounib

Dakhil, Salam

Dakhil Property Management, L.P.

Dakhil Management, LLC

Ryan's Corner Liquor

Shell Oil Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Werbin, Anthony

Defendant Attorney

Aziz, Zahra H.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

48237SummonsS0228e9d

Civil Complaint filed

48237Complain0051a40

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Civil case cover sheet

48237CivilCas012805e

4-22-22 Defendant's Case Management Statement

04/22/2022: 4-22-22 Defendant's Case Management Statement

1-28-22 Answer of Mounib Dakhil

01/28/2022: 1-28-22 Answer of Mounib Dakhil

1-28-22 Answer of Ryan's Corner

01/28/2022: 1-28-22 Answer of Ryan's Corner

1-28-22 Answer of Salam Dakhil

01/28/2022: 1-28-22 Answer of Salam Dakhil

Minute Order Attachment

01/21/2022: Minute Order Attachment

1/20/22 - Dismissal

01/20/2022: 1/20/22 - Dismissal

12/15/2021-Proof of Service (Shell Oil Company)

12/15/2021: 12/15/2021-Proof of Service (Shell Oil Company)

12/15/2021-Proof of Service

12/15/2021: 12/15/2021-Proof of Service

12/14/21 Proof of Service

12/14/2021: 12/14/21 Proof of Service

12/14/21 Proof of Service

12/14/2021: 12/14/21 Proof of Service

12/14/21 Proof of Service

12/14/2021: 12/14/21 Proof of Service

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

10/14/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

48237SummonsS0228e9d

10/14/2021: 48237SummonsS0228e9d

48237CivilCas012805e

10/12/2021: 48237CivilCas012805e

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ryan's Corner Liquor: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-00358 Dakhil, Mounib $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dakhil, Salam: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-00357 Dakhil, Mounib $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dakhil, Mounib: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-00356 Dakhil, Mounib $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For WEB-2022-06420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ryan's Corner Liquor: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Ryan's Corner Liquor; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Dakhil, Salam: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Dakhil, Salam; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rosas, Sheina: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-65081 Rosas, Sheina $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rosas, Sheina: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rosas, Sheina; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shell Oil Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZIZ, ZAHRA H.