This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/22/2022 at 15:49:31 (UTC).

Sharmaake Abdi vs. National Interstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Sharmaake Abdi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Interstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel, Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2602

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abdi, Sharmaake

Defendant

National Interstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Canada, Richard B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

4/6/2022-Supplemental Declaration of Richard B. Canada

04/06/2022: 4/6/2022-Supplemental Declaration of Richard B. Canada

Minute Order Attachment

11/03/2021: Minute Order Attachment

2021-11-01.Ntc of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

11/01/2021: 2021-11-01.Ntc of Posting Jury Fees.pdf

2021-11-01.National Interstate CMS.pdf

11/01/2021: 2021-11-01.National Interstate CMS.pdf

2021-10-01.[Proposed] Order Granting Demurrer.pdf

10/01/2021: 2021-10-01.[Proposed] Order Granting Demurrer.pdf

2021-10-01.Dec of RBC ISO Demurrer..pdf

10/01/2021: 2021-10-01.Dec of RBC ISO Demurrer..pdf

2021-10-01.MPA ISO Demurrer.pdf

10/01/2021: 2021-10-01.MPA ISO Demurrer.pdf

2021-10-01.Ntc of Demurrer.pdf

10/01/2021: 2021-10-01.Ntc of Demurrer.pdf

2021-10-01.Demurrer.pdf

10/01/2021: 2021-10-01.Demurrer.pdf

Opposition filed

09/10/2021: Opposition filed

Opposition

09/09/2021: Opposition

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

09/09/2021: Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment

09/07/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

03/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Filed 10/1/21 ~ Richard Canada

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of Richard B. Canada ISO Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for National Interstate Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-69420 National Interstate Insurance Company $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for National Interstate Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for National Interstate Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-62491 National Interstate Insurance Company $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension; Comment: Declaration of Richard B. Canada for Automatic Extension of Time to file a Responsive Pleading - as to National Interstate Insurance Company Pursuant to CCP 430.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Abdi, Sharmaake: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2020-00004147 Abdi, Sharmaake $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Abdi, Sharmaake: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Abdi, Sharmaake; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Interstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT