This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/22/2022 at 00:16:30 (UTC).

Severino Torralba vs. Stanley D. Alles/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Severino Torralba filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stanley D Alles/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2098

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Torralba, Severino Maximino

Mariscal, Phillip George

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Villasenor, Georgina Sierra

Estrella, Pedro

Defendants

Stan Alles Transport

Stanley D. Alles, Jr.

Montero, Jose Inez

Stanley D. Alles

Doe 1

Estate of Jose Ines Montero Vasquez, Deceased

SDA Transportation LLC

Alles, Stanley D

Justin Carey Enterprises, Inc.

Magana, Jesus Mendoza

Alles, Stanley Dale, JR

Montero, Jose Ines

Carey, Justin T

Extreme Industrial Coatings

Alles, Stanley, SR

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Busick, Mark B.

Jones, Andrew B.

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorney

Drozin, Garth M

Defendant Attorneys

Sevan, Gobel

Decker, Jason A.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Jeffrey Y. Choi New Attorney: Sevan Gobel

Case Management Statement Filed

3940574_359TORRALBAA; Comment: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Substitution of Attorney Old Attorney: Jeffrey Choi New Attorney: Sevan Gobel

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Naming Doe 1

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Minute Order Attachment

02/17/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

02/02/2021: Case Management Statement

39325CaseMana00d0a57

02/02/2021: 39325CaseMana00d0a57

Stipulation

01/29/2021: Stipulation

Case Management Statement

01/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order filed

01/14/2021: Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order

01/13/2021: Stipulation and Order

Request for Partial Dismissal

12/08/2020: Request for Partial Dismissal

4070334_089TORRALBAN

12/03/2020: 4070334_089TORRALBAN

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 7-14 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated 7-14 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed; Comment: Naming Doe 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Torralba, Severino Maximino: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-50114 Torralba, Severino Maximino $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Torralba, Severino Maximino: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Torralba, Severino Maximino; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stan Alles Transport is a litigant

Latest cases where Justin Carey Enterprises Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DROZIN GARTH M.