This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/07/2019 at 04:23:01 (UTC).

Sarah Marmolejo vs Olidio Mejorado

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Sarah Marmolejo against Olidio Mejorado in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2258

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marmolejo, Sarah

Marmolejo, Jennifer

Defendants

Bibiano, Marc

Mejorado, Olidio

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: Forwarded to: 502

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: appointing Jennifer Marmolejo as guardian as to Sarah Marmolejo

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed- Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: appointing Jennifer Marmolejo as guardian as to Sarah Marmolejo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received- Application for Guardian Ad Litem Received; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to: 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Marmolejo, Jennifer: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50461 Marmolejo, Jennifer $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Marmolejo, Jennifer: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Marmolejo, Jennifer; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less