This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/13/2021 at 15:04:42 (UTC).

Sante Health System, Inc. vs. Community Hospitals of Central California, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Sante Health System, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Community Hospitals of Central California, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2776

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sante Health System, Inc.

Community Medical Providers Medical Group, Inc.

Defendant

Community Hospitals of Central California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whelan, Walter W.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Wes Qualls

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Scott B. Wells

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in support of Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion ($60.00); Comment: and Motion to Consolidate. Hearing is set for 10-28-2021 at 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 403

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: & Certificate of Mailing

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Brief

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **duplicate proposed order re: ex parte on 9/30/21**

Order Received for Signature

Declaration; Comment: **order not signed; see hearing dated 9/30/21** Ex Parte Hearing ~

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Scott Wells

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Walter Whelan

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Ex parte Filed

Ex Parte Application; Comment: Hearing 9/30/21 ~ Ex Parte Application to Consolidate or Stay UD Action

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Wesley Qualls

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMotion - Consolidate- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: w/ 21CECL06875 - Walter Whelan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-62983 Sante Health System, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Wes Qualls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: of Scott B. Wells

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities- Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in support of Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Notice of Motion ($60.00); Comment: and Motion to Consolidate. Hearing is set for 10-28-2021 at 3:30 p.m. in Dept. 403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-61638 Sante Health System, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:29 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Consolidate with 21CECL06875 ~ Walter Whelan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-58830 Sante Health System, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sante Health System, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Sante Health System, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $555.00; Total Payments and Credits $555.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Community Hospitals of Central California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walter W. Whelan