This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 20:12:26 (UTC).

Samuel Flores vs. Isidro Morales Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Samuel Flores filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Isidro Morales Gonzalez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Brickey, Gabriel and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0234

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Flores, Samuel

Flores, Rosa

Defendants

Vandereyk, David

Morales Gonzalez, Isidro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dias, Steven S.

Defendant Attorneys

Malcolm, Stacey L.

O'Driscoll, Brian H.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

{{FilingCodeDescription}}

12/15/21 Notice of Change Handling Attorney

12/15/2021: 12/15/21 Notice of Change Handling Attorney

12/15/21 Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/15/2021: 12/15/21 Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice

10/01/2021: Notice

47461OBJECTIO001f2a0

09/22/2021: 47461OBJECTIO001f2a0

Stipulation

06/16/2021: Stipulation

Minute Order Attachment

06/09/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

05/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

04/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Jury Deposit

04/23/2021: Notice of Jury Deposit

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

04/23/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

04/05/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

03/16/2021: Proof of Service

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

01/28/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons

01/28/2021: Summons

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Change Handling Attorney and Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Firm Name and Address Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection filed; Comment: Objections to Deposition Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Russell D Cook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated Time 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: ***DEFECTIVE PROOF: Declaration of Due Diligence is missing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Flores, Samuel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-04240 Flores, Samuel $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Flores, Samuel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Flores, Samuel; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dias, Steven S.