This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:50:34 (UTC).

Samantha Alvarado vs. Harris Ranch Beef Company

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Samantha Alvarado filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Harris Ranch Beef Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3657

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarado, Samantha

Defendants

a California Corporation

Harris Ranch Beef Company

Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hart, Yana A.

Defendant Attorney

Helsley, Michael S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 4/22/21 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Civil case cover sheet

2) CCS - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

Summons issued and filed

3) Summons - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

1) Alvarado v. Harris Ranch_Complaint (Final).pdf

RequestDismissalALV.pdf

06/03/2021: RequestDismissalALV.pdf

Notice of Hearing

04/07/2021: Notice of Hearing

Signed NOS - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch .pdf

04/06/2021: Signed NOS - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch .pdf

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

01/27/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

POS - Harris Ranch.pdf

01/21/2021: POS - Harris Ranch.pdf

POS - Harris Ranch Holding.pdf

01/21/2021: POS - Harris Ranch Holding.pdf

Civil Document

12/31/2020: Civil Document

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

12/18/2020: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

3) Summons - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

12/18/2020: 3) Summons - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

2) CCS - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

12/16/2020: 2) CCS - Alvarado v. Harris Ranch.pdf

1) Alvarado v. Harris Ranch_Complaint (Final).pdf

12/16/2020: 1) Alvarado v. Harris Ranch_Complaint (Final).pdf

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Alvarado, Samantha; Harris Ranch Beef Company; Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company; Comment: With prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Hearing set for 7/21/2021 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2021-00159 Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris Ranch Beef Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2021-00158 Harris Ranch Beef Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For WEB-2021-04125

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris Ranch Beef Holding Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of New Time and Department for Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Alvarado, Samantha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-81012 Alvarado, Samantha $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Alvarado, Samantha: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Alvarado, Samantha; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 4/22/21 at 1:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less