This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 18:59:34 (UTC).

Sam Southichack vs. Community Medical Centers

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Sam Southichack filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Community Medical Centers. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Conklin, Jonathan, McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3414

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Conklin, Jonathan

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southichack, Sam

Defendants

Abdulian, John D., Medical Doctor

Watkins, Kristen J, Registered Nurse

Yamoah, Edward, Medical Doctor

Zaw, Myint, Medical Doctor

Wiley, Mylea N, Medical Doctor

Kelly, Melissa, Registered Nurse

Community Medical Centers, a California corporation

Khang Vu, R.P

Clovis Community Medical Center, a California corporation

Bauer, Stephanie, Doctor of Osteopathi

Baldozano, Corazon, Registered Nurse

Rashidian, Ali, Medical Doctor

Ogawa, Peter J., Pharma.D

Cihunka, Paul J. R.P.

Grossman, Stephen, M.D.

Nominal Defendants

Southichak, Khonsavanh

Southichak, Darom

 

Court Documents

Waiver of addt'l fees granted

Waiver of addt'l fees granted; Judicial Officer: Conklin, Jonathan

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Sam Southichack

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Certificate

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

3/17/2022 Minute Order Attachment

03/17/2022: 3/17/2022 Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

12/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

09/14/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

09/10/2021: Case Management Statement Filed

Minute Order Attachment

06/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

06/03/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

03/24/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Civil Document

12/30/2020: Civil Document

Waiver of addt'l fees granted

11/24/2020: Waiver of addt'l fees granted

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

11/20/2020: Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Southichack, Sam; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Certificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Additional Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Sam Southichack

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zaw, Myint, Medical Doctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Clovis Community Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Medical Centers is a litigant