This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 15:34:15 (UTC).

Salvador Ramirez vs. Monte Vista Orange Cove, LLC / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Salvador Ramirez filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Monte Vista Orange Cove, LLC / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1702

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jimenez, Antonio C

Ramirez, Salvador

Estrada, Maria Mondragon

Cervantes, Ana Hernandez

Franco, Jose

Carnero, Miriam L

Hernandez, Concepcion

Camacho, Maria Juan

Celaya, Sabrina

Carillo, Monica

Wood, Amanda L

Garcia, Alejandro

Islas, Janae Lannett

Gonzalez, Honorio

Lawson, Nicholas Allen

Ramirez, Ana

Hernandez, Virginia

Sanchez, Artemio

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Highlands Diversified, Inc.

a California Limited Liability Company

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Belton, Jeffrey T.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorney

Feld, Jason D.

Other Attorneys

Koper, Jacob

Hebesha, Amanda G.

Fidger, Angela R.

Paige, Robert N.

Iles, Andrew D

Morrow, William D

Hall, David M.

Printz, Matthew H.

Van De Poel, John

Hazen, Tyler E.

Mallen, Theresa L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

3570886_039CMCMorton

Case Management Statement Filed

3571192_059CMCGlassT

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Calendar Setting with Certificate of Mailing

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request For Dismissal - Wrap Homes

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Pretrial Order No. 7; continue 8/18/20 CMC to 11/3/2020

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Todd P. Pearsall - Associated

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Notice Filed

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/22 Minute Order Attachment

02/24/2022: 2/24/22 Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal

02/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

12/16/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

11/08/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Statement

11/03/2021: Statement

Minute Order Attachment

09/07/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Statement

09/02/2021: Statement

Request for Dismissal

08/04/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

08/04/2021: Request for Dismissal

305 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/24/2022

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Ramirez, Salvador; Monte Vista Orange Cove, LLC; Ramirez, Ana; Araujo, Yisidro Martinez; Avilez, Tomas Gallardo; Camacho, Maria Juan; Carillo, Monica; Carnero, Miriam L; Carranza, Gabriela; Celaya, Sabrina; Cervantes, Luzmar; Franco, Jose; Garcia, Alejandro; Gonzalez, Honorio; Zapien, Sandra Torres; Hernandez, Concepcion; Hernandez, Virginia; Cervantes, Ana Hernandez; Islas, Janae Lannett; Jimenez, Jose Guadalupe Jr; Jimenez, Antonio C; Lara, Irma; Lawson, Nicholas Allen; Estrada, Maria Mondragon; Ochoa, Jessica Marie; Ortis, Benjamin R; Sanchez, Artemio; Wood, Amanda L; Century Builders, LLC; Highlands Diversified, Inc.; Highlands Diversified, Inc.; Century Builders, LLC; Monte Vista Orange Cove, LLC; Art's Custom Cabinets, Inc.; B-F Glass, Inc.; Brian King Enterprises, Inc.; Broken Drum Insulation Visalia, Inc.; Bronco Concrete, Inc.; Rick Berry, Inc.; Central Air Conditioning; Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.; Central Valley Construction; Central Valley Contracting Specialists Inc; Sandoval, Daniel Felipe; Elia, Robert, JR; Glass Tech, Inc.; Hodges Electric, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Mike Blanks Drywall, Inc.; Morton & Brown Plumbing, Inc.; Mc Donald, Phillip Ernie, JR; Quality Carpets Design Center, Inc.; R & S Fence, Inc.; Superior Contracting Corporation; Solis, Rodolfo; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Visalia Counter Top Design, Inc.; Western Landscape Development, Inc.; Chavez, Sujeiri; Coronado, Dalia L.; De La Vega, Eliazar; Garcilazo, Baltazar; Carranza, Patricia; Huitron, Gonzalo; Loera, Carina; Montalvo, Francisca; Montanez, Christopher; Montanez, Marie; Moreno, Juan Manuel; Castillo, Ana Silva; Rangel, Ana Rosa; Rodriguez, Isela; Sahagun, Robert; Sanchez, Hector; Velasquez, Rocio; Wucinski, Gary; Wucinski, Margaret; Zepeda, Alicia; Zepeda, Jose; Superior Contracting Corporation; MOES 1-100; Comment: without prejudice; Comment; Comment: (No further hearings are necessam. Due to no aggearances by Plaintiff on the second cross complaint, case is here by dismissed. The case is concluded.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with certificate of mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Highlands Diversified, Inc.; Century Builders, LLC; Monte Vista Orange Cove, LLC; Art's Custom Cabinets, Inc.; B-F Glass, Inc.; Brian King Enterprises, Inc.; Broken Drum Insulation Visalia, Inc.; Bronco Concrete, Inc.; Rick Berry, Inc.; Central Air Conditioning; Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.; Central Valley Construction; Central Valley Contracting Specialists Inc; Sandoval, Daniel Felipe; Elia, Robert, JR; Glass Tech, Inc.; Hodges Electric, Inc.; Madera Roofing, Inc.; Mike Blanks Drywall, Inc.; Morton & Brown Plumbing, Inc.; Mc Donald, Phillip Ernie, JR; Quality Carpets Design Center, Inc.; R & S Fence, Inc.; Superior Contracting Corporation; Solis, Rodolfo; Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.; Visalia Counter Top Design, Inc.; Western Landscape Development, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment; Comment: (As to 1st Cross Complaint)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for Dismissal Entire XC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with certificate of mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketMotion - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Courtney Winzeler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers with certificate of mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
328 More Docket Entries
06/20/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service; Comment: Highlands Diversified, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service; Comment: Century Builders, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Salvador: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-39451 Ramirez, Salvador $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019

FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Salvador: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019

FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Salvador; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 9/17/19 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes. (Judge Kimberly A. Gaab)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case cover sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Complaint filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/01/1900

DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less