This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 13:51:37 (UTC).

Roberto Cruz vs. Fresno Auto Sales

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Roberto Cruz filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fresno Auto Sales. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2088

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz, Roberto Macin

Defendants

Fresno Auto Sales

Gad Said Ibrahim

The Guarantee Company of North America, USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roberts, Ben

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order on Fee Waiver; Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order on Fee Waiver; Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Amended Document Filed

Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- dismissal.pdf; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Cruz, Roberto Macin; Fresno Auto Sales; Gad Said Ibrahim; The Guarantee Company of North America, USA; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed- Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cruz, Roberto Macin: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cruz, Roberto Macin: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Cruz, Roberto Macin; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order on Fee Waiver; Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant