This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 12:14:33 (UTC).

Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust vs. Al Saoudi Yousef / UD

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Al Saoudi Yousef / UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2745

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust

Defendants

Yousef, Al Saoudi Sinan

Fresno Auto Traders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coronado, Louie

Defendant Attorney

Makasian, James M.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

At Issue Memorandum

Request to Set Case for Trial

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: as to All Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Yousef, Al Saoudi Sinan: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-65898 Yousef, Al Saoudi Sinan $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Yousef, Al Saoudi Sinan: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Yousef, Al Saoudi Sinan; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt Issue Memorandum- Request to Set Case for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: as to All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-62593 Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rob Solley, Trustee of Rob Solley Living Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Fresno Auto Traders is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKASIAN, JAMES M.