This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/22/2022 at 17:52:53 (UTC).

Rick Hudson vs. The McCaffrey Group, Inc. / COMPLEX / LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Rick Hudson filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against The McCaffrey Group, Inc / COMPLEX / LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, McGuire, Rosemary, Tharpe, D Tyler and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2630

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wallace, Tammy

Lee, Joseph

Hudson, Kimberly

Lee, Dallas

Lane, Shelley

Hudson, Rick

Lane, Grady

Cisneros, Anita

Cisneros, Albert

Lombera, Julio

Novoa, Raymond

Pena, Gregory

Poe, Jillian

Smiley, Bethann

Pena, Evelyne

Smiley, Paul

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

The McCaffrey Group, Inc.

A. Colmenero Plastering, Inc.

Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc.

Anlin Window Systems

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Makarczyk, Mayo

Iniguez, Miguel A

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Galloway, Edward A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Civil Complaint filed

2020 9 9 Original Complaint MERGED.pdf

Summons issued and filed

2020 9 9 Sums 100.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

2020 9 9 Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

04/21/2022: Minute Order Attachment

4/21/2022-Request for Dismissal

04/21/2022: 4/21/2022-Request for Dismissal

04.11.2022 Notice of Hearing-Status Conference set for 04.21.2022 moved from Dept. 503 to Dept. 501

04/11/2022: 04.11.2022 Notice of Hearing-Status Conference set for 04.21.2022 moved from Dept. 503 to Dept. 501

04.11.2022 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes to Judge D. Tyler Tharpe Filed

04/11/2022: 04.11.2022 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes to Judge D. Tyler Tharpe Filed

04.11.2022 Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Kimberly A. Gaab Disqualifies Self

04/11/2022: 04.11.2022 Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Kimberly A. Gaab Disqualifies Self

Status Conf Statement of McCaffrey Group.pdf

04/08/2022: Status Conf Statement of McCaffrey Group.pdf

Status Conf Statement of McCaffrey Group.pdf

04/08/2022: Status Conf Statement of McCaffrey Group.pdf

12/3/21 NTC of Association of Counsel

12/03/2021: 12/3/21 NTC of Association of Counsel

12.2.21 Notice of Hearing

12/02/2021: 12.2.21 Notice of Hearing

Notice Filed

11/01/2021: Notice Filed

48996Motionfo0018262

10/29/2021: 48996Motionfo0018262

Notice Filed

10/20/2021: Notice Filed

Notice Filed

10/20/2021: Notice Filed

Stipulation and Order filed

10/18/2021: Stipulation and Order filed

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance Via Courtcall; Comment: Plaintiffs counsel: Levi Plesset Defendants counsel: Kacy Thompson, Edward Galloway, Tyson Young, Stephan Bays

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: with certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Case is stayed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: ***Department Change Only***Status Conference Hearing set for April 21, 2022 @ 3:30 p.m. is now set in Dept. 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of reassignment of Judge for All Purposes to Judge D. Tyler Tharpe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self; Comment: Judge Gaab

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: Status Conference. Hearing 4-19-2022 at 3:30 p.m. Dept 503.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: Status Conference. Hearing 4-19-2022 at 3:30 p.m. Dept 503

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: and certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 1:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Calendar Setting; CMC on 1/12 reset to 1/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Dallas: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-59837 Lee, Dallas $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Dallas: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Lee, Dallas; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The McCaffrey Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Galloway, Edward A.