This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 12:13:47 (UTC).

Richard Garcia vs Francisco Gama

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Richard Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Francisco Gama. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Negin, Stephanie, Tharpe, D Tyler and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1247

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Negin, Stephanie

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia, Richard

Balandran, Mallorie

Defendants

Gama, Francisco

Bimbo Bakeries USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reeves, Daniel J.

 

Court Documents

4/25/2022 Complaint

04/25/2022: 4/25/2022 Complaint

4/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

04/25/2022: 4/25/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

4/26/2022 Summons

04/26/2022: 4/26/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/26/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Balandran, Mallorie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-25654 Balandran, Mallorie $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Balandran, Mallorie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Balandran, Mallorie; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REEVES DANIEL JAMES