This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/29/2022 at 12:35:44 (UTC).

Reyna Perez vs Jesse Navarette

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Reyna Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jesse Navarette. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3663

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perez, Reyna

Cabrera, Daisy

Cabrera, Brianda

Lamas, Audrey

de Jesus, Zuri

Defendant

Navarette, Jesse John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kreit, Theodore

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

12/13/21 - Complaint

Summons issued and filed

12/13/21 - Summons

Civil case cover sheet

12/13/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

12/13/21 - Complaint

12/13/2021: 12/13/21 - Complaint

12/13/21 - Summons

12/13/2021: 12/13/21 - Summons

12/13/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: 12/13/21 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

12/13/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/20/22 Case Management Statement

04/20/2022: 4/20/22 Case Management Statement

4/20/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

04/20/2022: 4/20/22 Notice of Jury Deposit

4/26/22 Minute Order Attachment

04/26/2022: 4/26/22 Minute Order Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Reyna: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-24420 Perez, Reyna $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Reyna: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Reyna: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-78367 Perez, Reyna $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Reyna: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Perez, Reyna; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREIT THEODORE