This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 15:03:35 (UTC).

Resurgence Capital LLC vs. Catherine Crognali

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Resurgence Capital LLC against Catherine Crognali in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6278

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Resurgence Capital LLC

Defendant

Crognali, Catherine

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Bankruptcy Status Conference

Notice or Order Staying Action

Notice

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Catherine Cognali

Summons issued and filed

Resurgence_MN005727_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Resurgence_MN005727_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

Resurgence_MN005727_rfe_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Resurgence_MN005727_ccs_eABC.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Resurgence_MN005727_com_eABC.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • Bankruptcy Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:33 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Bankruptcy Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice or Order Staying Action- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Non-Service of Summons and Complaint as to Catherine Cognali

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Resurgence_MN005727_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- Resurgence_MN005727_rfe_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Resurgence_MN005727_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Resurgence_MN005727_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Resurgence Capital LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50380 Resurgence Capital LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial info for Resurgence Capital LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Financial: Resurgence Capital LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less