This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 11:34:20 (UTC).

REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT / Tracy Callahan vs. First Student, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT / Tracy Callahan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against First Student, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2352

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Callahan, Tracy

Defendants

First Student, Inc.

a Delaware Corporation

FirstGroup America, Inc.

First Student Management, LLC

a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Michael J.F.

Defendant Attorney

Eddings, Ryan L.

 

Court Documents

8/3/22 Complaint

08/03/2022: 8/3/22 Complaint

8/3/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/03/2022: 8/3/22 Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/22 Summons

08/03/2022: 8/3/22 Summons

8/3/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

08/03/2022: 8/3/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

8-8-22 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: First Student Management, LLC

08/08/2022: 8-8-22 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re: First Student Management, LLC

9-1-22 Defendants' General Denial

09/01/2022: 9-1-22 Defendants' General Denial

9-2-22 Defendant's Notice to State Court of Removal of Civil Action

09/02/2022: 9-2-22 Defendant's Notice to State Court of Removal of Civil Action

9-2-22 Defendant's Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action

09/02/2022: 9-2-22 Defendant's Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Removed to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Student Management, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-02803 First Student, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FirstGroup America, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-02802 First Student, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Student, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2022-02801 First Student, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTransfer of Fees Completed; Comment: For Receipt #WEB-2022-54425

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Student Management, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: First Student Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FirstGroup America, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FirstGroup America, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for First Student, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 08/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Callahan, Tracy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-47439 Callahan, Tracy $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Callahan, Tracy: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Callahan, Tracy; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST STUDENT MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where FirstGroup America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant