This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 17:39:58 (UTC).

Reginald Hill vs. Greyhound

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Reginald Hill filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Greyhound. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1420

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hill, Reginald

Defendant

Greyhound

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Hill, Reginald; Awarded Against:; Greyhound; Amount; Damages: $1,140.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $1210.00; Comment: $30.00 to be paid back to the Court, $40.00 to Fresno Sheriff Department for fees waived upon satisfaction of judgment.; Party Names: Hill, Reginald; Greyhound

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance for hearing by plaintiff

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Deputy Clerk

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Hill, Reginald; Awarded Against:; Greyhound; Amount; Damages: $1,140.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $1210.00; Comment: $30.00 to be paid back to the Court, $40.00 to Fresno Sheriff Department for fees waived upon satisfaction of judgment.; Party Names: Hill, Reginald; Greyhound

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Hill, Reginald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$40.00-Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Filed- Request Filed; Comment: 1st Continuance for hearing by plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hill, Reginald: Fee Waiver $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hill, Reginald: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Hill, Reginald; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: By Deputy Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less