This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 14:02:20 (UTC).

Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company vs. Satish Rao

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Satish Rao. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0675

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Defendant

Rao, Satish Balusu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoeck, Michael D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

40508Complain009028f

Summons issued and filed

40508SummonsS01284d4

Civil case cover sheet

40508CivilCas0267ac1

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 7/7/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Proof of Service

42553ProofofS0039a08

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Stipulation; Comment: **** CASE IS NOT AT ISSUE **** Party(s) who signed: Michael Schoeck ADR method chosen:

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Conditional Settlement Reached

44706Noticeof000f871; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 8/30/2021

Notice of Hearing

CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing Date: 11/3/2021 Time: 3:30 PM Dept: 402

Notice Filed

44854Noticeto0031081; Comment: NO ACTION TAKEN NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 7/8/21

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed- Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Rao, Satish Balusu; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- 44854Noticeto0031081; Comment: NO ACTION TAKEN NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 7/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Scheduled Hearing Date: 11/3/2021 Time: 3:30 PM Dept: 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached- 44706Noticeof000f871; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 8/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed- Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- 42553ProofofS0039a08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-13679 Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 7/7/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 40508CivilCas0267ac1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- 40508SummonsS01284d4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 40508Complain009028f

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDWOOD FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D