This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 19:23:28 (UTC).

Red Triangle Oil Company vs. Fifth Wheel Truck Stop, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Red Triangle Oil Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fifth Wheel Truck Stop, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3384

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Red Triangle Oil Company

Defendants

Fifth Wheel Truck Stop, Inc.

Zabarsky, Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quall, Matthew W

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment

11/09/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Declaration

11/08/2021: Declaration

Request

11/08/2021: Request

Request for Dismissal

11/08/2021: Request for Dismissal

Application

11/08/2021: Application

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/08/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration

11/08/2021: Declaration

Declaration

11/08/2021: Declaration

Judgment

11/08/2021: Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

07/09/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

07/02/2021: Case Management Statement

Order Denied

04/22/2021: Order Denied

Minute Order Attachment

03/24/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

03/23/2021: Judgment

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Amended Declaration of James Shehadey iso Red Triangle Oil Co.'s Application for Court Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Default previously entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review; Comment: Request for DOE Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Filed; Comment: Red Triangle Oil Co.'s Amended Application for Court Judgment On Declaration In Lieu Of Personal Testimony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: Amended Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Of Red Triangle Oil Co.'s Application for Court Judgment On Declaration In Lieu Of Personal Testimony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Amended Declaration Regarding Costs Incurred For Service of Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of New Time and Department for Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Red Triangle Oil Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-75080 Red Triangle Oil Company $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Red Triangle Oil Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Red Triangle Oil Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth Wheel Truck Stop and Paloo, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Triangle Oil Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUALL MATTHEW WARREN