This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 21:37:52 (UTC).

Rebecca Ambrifi vs. Wilson Homes, Inc. / COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Rebecca Ambrifi filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Wilson Homes, Inc / COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1076

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sexenian, Leon

Mehta, Dolly Gagan

Follente, Mark

Moreno, Fernando

Thomas, Erin P.

Freitas, Ashley

Thomas, Victoria

Pradhan, Ashwini

Sexenian, Stephanie

Birdsell, Madison

Berrelleza, Cristian

Valdez, Abel

Marquardt, Dennis K.

Luu, Hong Gia

Moser, Rhonda Krstine

Hughes, Trina

134 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chodzko, Megan M

Other Attorneys

Jones, Todd A

Marshall, Kristi D.

Anderson, Jeffrey L.

Schoneman, Tina L

Gary, Todd B

 

Court Documents

s-ICMS-DEF FRESNO SHOWER DOOR 8-11-22.pdf

07/22/2022: s-ICMS-DEF FRESNO SHOWER DOOR 8-11-22.pdf

Order filed

07/20/2022: Order filed

Case Management Statement

07/20/2022: Case Management Statement

7/15/22 - Proposed Pretrial Order

07/15/2022: 7/15/22 - Proposed Pretrial Order

07-13-22 Notice of Jury Deposit

07/13/2022: 07-13-22 Notice of Jury Deposit

07-13-22 Meraz Roofing, Inc's Answer to Wilson Homes, Inc. Cross Complaint

07/13/2022: 07-13-22 Meraz Roofing, Inc's Answer to Wilson Homes, Inc. Cross Complaint

6-30-22 Allstar Garage Door, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint

06/30/2022: 6-30-22 Allstar Garage Door, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint

6/23/22 Answer

06/23/2022: 6/23/22 Answer

CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

06/23/2022: CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

06/23/2022: CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

06/23/2022: CV-47A Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes w/Clerk Cert

6/23/2022 Answer

06/23/2022: 6/23/2022 Answer

Minute Order Attachment

04/14/2022: Minute Order Attachment

4/11/22 - Summons on 1st Cross Complaint

04/12/2022: 4/11/22 - Summons on 1st Cross Complaint

4/11/22 - 1st Cross Complaint

04/11/2022: 4/11/22 - 1st Cross Complaint

4/11/22 - Answer to First Amended Complaint

04/11/2022: 4/11/22 - Answer to First Amended Complaint

4/5/22 Proof of Service

04/05/2022: 4/5/22 Proof of Service

4/1/22 - Defective Proof of Service

04/01/2022: 4/1/22 - Defective Proof of Service

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Meraz Roofing, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-44024 Meraz Roofing, Inc. $1585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Meraz Roofing, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Meraz Roofing, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Signed order forwarded to clerks office 07/20/22 [Proposed] Pre-Trial Order No. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: MERAZ ROOFING, INC. S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed; Comment: Plaintiffs' First Amendment to Complaint Naming Additional Homeowners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party; Names: Ambrifi, Rebecca; Anders, Robert; Anders, Loretta; Bennington, Michael P.; Bennington, Valery Garcia; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to complaints filed by)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ambrifi, Rebecca: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-23640 Ambrifi, Rebecca $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ambrifi, Rebecca: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Ambrifi, Rebecca; Total Financial Assessment $1,625.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,625.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/18/21 in Dept. 403 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less