This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:50:17 (UTC).

Raul Ramirez vs. Harris Ranch Beef Company

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Raul Ramirez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Harris Ranch Beef Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Brickey, Gabriel, Negin, Stephanie and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1605

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Brickey, Gabriel

Negin, Stephanie

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramirez, Raul

Ballinger, Wade

Defendant

Harris Ranch Beef Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tillmon, Seth E.

Defendant Attorneys

Helsley, Michael S.

Vote, Steven K.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Summons issued and filed

Summons - Ramirez.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Civil case cover sheet

CivCovSht - Ramirez.pdf

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: of Deposit of Jury Fees

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Stip. Re ADR - Ramirez.pdf

01/06/2022: Stip. Re ADR - Ramirez.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

09/29/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Jury Deposit

09/29/2021: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement

09/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

07/28/2021: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Signed POS 16412960.pdf

06/18/2021: Signed POS 16412960.pdf

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

06/04/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

CivCovSht - Ramirez.pdf

06/04/2021: CivCovSht - Ramirez.pdf

Complaint - Ramirez.pdf

06/04/2021: Complaint - Ramirez.pdf

Summons - Ramirez.pdf

06/04/2021: Summons - Ramirez.pdf

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 5-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Russell Cook

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris Ranch Beef Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-61535 Harris Ranch Beef Company $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harris Ranch Beef Company: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated 5-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Deposit of Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 06/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Raul: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-34813 Ramirez, Raul $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Raul: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Raul; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Emailed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less