This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 03:34:58 (UTC).

Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company vs. Fiore Di Pasta, Inc., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fiore Di Pasta, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0876

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Defendants

Primavera, Benedetta

Fiore Di Pasta, Inc., a California corporation

in her capacity as Trustee of the Panfilo and Benedetta Primavera Family Trust- Survivor's Trust dated April 7, 2006 as amended November 30, 2010

Primavera Holdings I, LLC, a California limited liability company

Primavera, Anthony

Primavera, Panfilo, JR

DLL Finance LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Waste, J. Jackson

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 7/28/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Full Dismissal; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Fiore Di Pasta, Inc., a California corporation; Primavera Holdings I, LLC, a California limited liability company; Primavera, Benedetta; Primavera, Panfilo, JR; Primavera, Anthony; DLL Finance LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Full Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-18959 Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 7/28/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RABO AGRIFINANCE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Jackson Waste