This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/07/2022 at 13:06:49 (UTC).

Progressive Select Insurance Company vs. Lourdes Huerta

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Progressive Select Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lourdes Huerta. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3023

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Defendant

Huerta, Lourdes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nivinskus, Mark R

 

Court Documents

5/17/2022 - Complaint

05/17/2022: 5/17/2022 - Complaint

5/17/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/17/2022: 5/17/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022 - Statement of Damages

05/17/2022: 5/17/2022 - Statement of Damages

5/19/2022 - Summons

05/19/2022: 5/19/2022 - Summons

5/19/2022 - CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

05/19/2022: 5/19/2022 - CV-16 Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Progressive Select Insurance Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-30759 Progressive Select Insurance Company $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Progressive Select Insurance Company: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Progressive Select Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 9/13/2022 at 3:30 p.m. in Department 402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed; Comment: of Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT