This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 08:29:14 (UTC).

Pleasant Village Preservation LP vs. Amy Gault

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Pleasant Village Preservation LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Amy Gault. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1445

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pleasant Village Preservation LP

Defendant

Gault, Amy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Li, Laurie

 

Court Documents

Restitution of Premises Judgment

05/20/2022: Restitution of Premises Judgment

4/12/2022 Judgment After Court Trial

04/12/2022: 4/12/2022 Judgment After Court Trial

7/1/22 Return filed

07/01/2022: 7/1/22 Return filed

6/2/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

06/02/2022: 6/2/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

5/6/2022 Return filed

05/06/2022: 5/6/2022 Return filed

4/19/2022 Writ of Possession Issued

04/19/2022: 4/19/2022 Writ of Possession Issued

4/12/2022 Minute Order Attachment

04/12/2022: 4/12/2022 Minute Order Attachment

3/25/2022 - Notice of Calendar Setting w/ Zoom Info

03/25/2022: 3/25/2022 - Notice of Calendar Setting w/ Zoom Info

3/24/2022 - Proof of Service All Occupants.

03/24/2022: 3/24/2022 - Proof of Service All Occupants.

3/24/2022 - Proof of Service for Amy Gault

03/24/2022: 3/24/2022 - Proof of Service for Amy Gault

3/24/2022 - At Issue Memorandum

03/24/2022: 3/24/2022 - At Issue Memorandum

Amy Gaultt_fw-003.pdf

03/17/2022: Amy Gaultt_fw-003.pdf

3/17/22 Amy Gaultt_answer.pdf

03/17/2022: 3/17/22 Amy Gaultt_answer.pdf

03/09/2022 CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

03/09/2022: 03/09/2022 CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

03/09/2022 CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

03/09/2022: 03/09/2022 CV-56 Notice of Restricted Access

03/09/2022 CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing 5/10/22

03/09/2022: 03/09/2022 CV-15 Notice of Dismissal Hearing 5/10/22

03/08/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/08/2022: 03/08/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/08/2022 Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

03/08/2022: 03/08/2022 Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Return of writ of execution Filed wholly unsatisfied as to possession only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pleasant Village Preservation LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-33327 Pleasant Village Preservation LP $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pleasant Village Preservation LP: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party; Names: Pleasant Village Preservation LP; Gault, Amy; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To; Pleasant Village Preservation LP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at; 3605 North Pleasant Avenue #A108, Fresno, Fresno County, CA 93705; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against; Gault, Amy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: By mail RE: Application to Correct Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Order Fwd: To Clerks office for processing on 5/20/22 Forwarded to Dept: 402 on 5/17/2022 PENDING REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketApplication Filed; Comment: To Correct Judgment for Clerical Error Declaration of Calvin Clements; AMENDED Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pleasant Village Preservation LP: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-14995 Pleasant Village Preservation LP $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pleasant Village Preservation LP: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Pleasant Village Preservation LP; Total Financial Assessment $320.00; Total Payments and Credits $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Notice of Restricted Access) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (3/9/22) . Parties served: (Amy Gault, All Occupants)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: UDDI set 5/10/22 in Dept 404 at 8:30 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Comment: Non-Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less