This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 01:31:00 (UTC).

Plaintiff ROE 2 vs. Riverdale Assembly of God Church, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Plaintiff ROE 2 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Riverdale Assembly of God Church, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaab, Kimberly, Negin, Stephanie, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Whalen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1108

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Negin, Stephanie

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Whalen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROE 2, Plaintiff

ROE 33, Plaintiff

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Riverdale Assembly of God Church, Inc.

The General Council of the Assemblies of God

DOE 2

The Southern California District Council of the Assemblies of God

DOE 3

Spencer, Charles, JR

DOE 4

Riverdale Christian Academy, a California non-profit religious corporation

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Spencer, Charles, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dias, Steven S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Odegaard, Sarah G.

Helsley, Michael S.

Vote, Steven K.

Kubein, Ramsey

Sherman, Sam G.

Brown, Kevin M

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Sherman, Sam G.

 

Court Documents

4/15/22 Proposed Order

04/15/2022: 4/15/22 Proposed Order

4/15/22 Ex Parte Application

04/15/2022: 4/15/22 Ex Parte Application

4/12/22 - Complaint

04/12/2022: 4/12/22 - Complaint

4/12/22 - Summons

04/13/2022: 4/12/22 - Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/13/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/15/22 Declaration

04/15/2022: 4/15/22 Declaration

CV-47 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes

04/15/2022: CV-47 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes

4/12/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/12/2022: 4/12/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3-22-23 (Proposed) Order Regarding Remote Appearance

03/22/2023: 3-22-23 (Proposed) Order Regarding Remote Appearance

3-22-23 Notice of Remote Appearance

03/22/2023: 3-22-23 Notice of Remote Appearance

Stipulation

03/22/2023: Stipulation

2-1-23 Amended Proof of Service Re Cross-Defendant s Answer to Cross-Complaint

02/01/2023: 2-1-23 Amended Proof of Service Re Cross-Defendant s Answer to Cross-Complaint

1/31/2023 Answer to 1st Cross Complaint

01/31/2023: 1/31/2023 Answer to 1st Cross Complaint

1-19-23 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)

01/19/2023: 1-19-23 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)

01/10/23 Answer

01/10/2023: 01/10/23 Answer

12-8-22 First Cross-Complaint

12/08/2022: 12-8-22 First Cross-Complaint

12/08/22 Minute Order Attachment

12/08/2022: 12/08/22 Minute Order Attachment

11-29-22 Notice of Jury Fees Posted

11/29/2022: 11-29-22 Notice of Jury Fees Posted

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2024
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2024
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *** NO ACTION TAKEN HEARING OFF CALENDAR *** (Proposed) Order Regarding Remote Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance.; Comment: Party: Defendant Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jessica Mulvaney (Connie) 858-408-6903

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Amended Proof of Service Re Cross-Defendant The General Council of the Assemblies of God s Answer to Charles Spencer, Jr. s Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: To 1st Cross Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: ~ Order signed and fowarded to clerk's office on 4/20/22 for further porcessing ~ **Pending Ex parte hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Steven S. Dias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx parte Filed; Comment: for in Camera review of Seal Certificates of Merit, Permit Service on Doe Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROE 2, Plaintiff: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-22810 ROE 2, Plaintiff $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROE 2, Plaintiff: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ROE 2, Plaintiff; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less