*******1108
04/12/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Fresno, California
Gaab, Kimberly
Negin, Stephanie
Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.
Whalen, Robert
ROE 2, Plaintiff
ROE 33, Plaintiff
Riverdale Assembly of God Church, Inc.
The General Council of the Assemblies of God
DOE 2
The Southern California District Council of the Assemblies of God
DOE 3
Spencer, Charles, JR
DOE 4
Riverdale Christian Academy, a California non-profit religious corporation
Spencer, Charles, JR
Dias, Steven S.
Odegaard, Sarah G.
Helsley, Michael S.
Vote, Steven K.
Kubein, Ramsey
Sherman, Sam G.
Brown, Kevin M
Sherman, Sam G.
08/11/2022: 8/11/22 Deft's Notice of Jury Deposit
08/01/2022: 8/1/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted
07/20/2022: 7/20/2022-Answer
06/16/2022: 6-16-22 The Assemblies of God's Answer
06/03/2022: 6/3/22 Proof of Service
05/20/2022: 5/20/22 Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee
04/28/2022: 4/28/22 - Proof of Service - Southern District Counsel
04/20/2022: 4/20/22 First Amended Complaint
04/25/2022: 4-25-22 Proof of Service of FAC and summons to FAC re: Riverdale Assembly
03/22/2023: 3-22-23 Notice of Remote Appearance
03/22/2023: Stipulation
01/19/2023: 1-19-23 Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Re-assignment)
11/23/2022: Case Management Statement
11/23/2022: 11-23-22 Notice Filed
11/23/2022: 11/23/2022 Case Management Statement
11/23/2022: 11/23/2022 Case Management Statement
11/23/2022: 11/23/22 Case Management Statement HRG: 12/08/22
08/04/2022: Case Management Statement
DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM
[-] Read LessDocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Whalen, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar
[-] Read LessDocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: *** NO ACTION TAKEN HEARING OFF CALENDAR *** (Proposed) Order Regarding Remote Appearance
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Remote Appearance.; Comment: Party: Defendant Type of Appearance Requested: CourtCall
[-] Read LessDocketADR Stipulation Mediation filed; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD
[-] Read LessDocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Jessica Mulvaney (Connie) 858-408-6903
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service; Comment: Amended Proof of Service Re Cross-Defendant The General Council of the Assemblies of God s Answer to Charles Spencer, Jr. s Cross-Complaint
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer Filed; Comment: To 1st Cross Complaint
[-] Read LessDocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: ~ Order signed and fowarded to clerk's office on 4/20/22 for further porcessing ~ **Pending Ex parte hearing
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Steven S. Dias
[-] Read LessDocketEx parte Filed; Comment: for in Camera review of Seal Certificates of Merit, Permit Service on Doe Defendants
[-] Read LessFinancialFinancial info for ROE 2, Plaintiff: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-22810 ROE 2, Plaintiff $435.00
[-] Read LessFinancialFinancial info for ROE 2, Plaintiff: Transaction Assessment $435.00
[-] Read LessFinancialFinancial: ROE 2, Plaintiff; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes
[-] Read LessDocketSummons issued and filed
[-] Read LessDocketCivil case cover sheet
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Complaint filed
[-] Read Less