This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 09:34:16 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE 20CECG02098

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE 20CECG02098 was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3076

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariscal, Phillip George

Defendants

Extreme Industrial Coatings

Magana, Jesus Mendoza

Alles, Stanley Dale, JR

Justin Carey Enterprises, Inc.

Stan Alles Transport

Alles, Stanley, SR

Montero, Jose Ines

Carey, Justin T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, Andrew B.

Defendant Attorneys

Decker, Jason A.

Sevan, Gobel

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Notice Filed

4070345_611MARISCALN; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Declaration; Comment: Jury Deposit

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order filed

01/14/2021: Stipulation and Order filed

Notice

01/07/2021: Notice

Notice

01/07/2021: Notice

Proof of Service

01/07/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

01/06/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

01/06/2021: Proof of Service

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

12/23/2020: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

4070345_611MARISCALN

12/03/2020: 4070345_611MARISCALN

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

10/23/2020: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

10/21/2020: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons

10/20/2020: Summons

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party; Names: Montero, Jose Ines; Mariscal, Phillip George; Stan Alles Transport; Alles, Stanley Dale, JR; Alles, Stanley, SR; Magana, Jesus Mendoza; Justin Carey Enterprises, Inc.; Extreme Industrial Coatings; Carey, Justin T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Comment: consolidate with lead case #20CECG02098

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 11/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -Stanley Dale Alles, Jr. (DEFECTIVE as person who signed the form did not include his/her title or on whose behalf he/she signed for as requested on the Notice of Acknowledgment form)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -Stanl Alles Transport (DEFECTIVE as person who signed the form did not include his/her title or on whose behalf he/she signed for as requested on the Notice of Acknowledgment form)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 11/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 11/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer or Other Responsive Pleading Received; Comment: Answer for Defendants Stanley Dale Alles, JR. and Stan Alles Transport pending in the queue due to fee glitch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mariscal, Phillip George: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-68607 Mariscal, Phillip George $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mariscal, Phillip George: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Mariscal, Phillip George; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stan Alles Transport is a litigant

Latest cases where Justin Carey Enterprises Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Andrew B.