This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 16:00:23 (UTC).

Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC vs. Gabriel Perez

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gabriel Perez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7808

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC

Individual Foodservice

Defendants

Perez, Gabriel M.

Q Ranch Wholesale Distribution

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sherman, Gary S.

Defendant Attorney

Santana, Arturo

 

Court Documents

10/27/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022: 10/27/2022 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022 - Complaint

10/27/2022: 10/27/2022 - Complaint

10/31/2022 - Summons

10/31/2022: 10/31/2022 - Summons

12-20-22 - Proof Of Service

12/20/2022: 12-20-22 - Proof Of Service

12/28/2022 - Answer filed

12/28/2022: 12/28/2022 - Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Gabriel M.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-80560 Perez, Gabriel M. $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perez, Gabriel M.: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Perez, Gabriel M.; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-67482 Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less