This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/07/2020 at 01:19:27 (UTC).

Paul Sherman vs. Capstone & Advanced Prosthetics

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Paul Sherman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Capstone Advanced Prosthetics. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Tharpe, D Tyler and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0589

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Tharpe, D Tyler

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherman, Paul William

Defendant

Capstone & Advanced Prosthetics

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers re: Hearing Fee Waiver

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Fee Waiver Hearing Set

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Fee Waiver Denied

Fee Waiver Denied; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Last Day to Pay 3/4/2020

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Complaint filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil case cover sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketHearing - Fee Waiver- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Comment: cont. per the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers re: Hearing Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Fee Waiver Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Comment: Court needs more information as indicated on Order. Forwarded to clerks office 02/21/20, for further processing. Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for: Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Denied- Fee Waiver Denied; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Last Day to Pay 3/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sherman, Paul William: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Sherman, Paul William; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Comment: Signed/Denied and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Civil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.