This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 20:40:51 (UTC).

Paul Ramirez vs Fernando Trejo

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Paul Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Fernando Trejo. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1745

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Paul A.

Defendants

Trejo, Fernando De Jesus Zuniga

Altamirano Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mamann, David

Defendant Attorney

Hitchcock, Kara L.

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Notice Filed

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Answer Filed

45444AnswerRe00c9e2e

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: 5-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Ramirez, Paul A.; Trejo, Fernando De Jesus Zuniga; Altamirano Construction, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJury Requested by Party- Comment: Estimated Time 5-6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReferral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Paul A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-38052 Ramirez, Paul A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Paul A.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Paul A.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hitchcock, Kara L.