This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 17:29:21 (UTC).

Patricia Ramirez vs. Monica Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Patricia Ramirez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Monica Garcia. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Pebet, Noelle and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6288

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Pebet, Noelle

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramirez, Patricia Ann

Albert Ramirez Bail Bonds

Defendant

Garcia, Monica R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Albert W.

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF ALBERT W. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forward to Civil Examiner on 08/21/19.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Ramirez, Patricia Ann; Garcia, Monica R.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Ramirez, Patricia Ann; Awarded Against:; Garcia, Monica R.; Amount; Damages: $4,821.50; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $120.12; Attorney Fees: $964.30; Costs: $275.63; Total: $6181.55

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC is set for 10/31/19 in D402 at 3:30pm

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6,206.55

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Monica R. Garcia

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF GRACE ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Patricia Ann: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-84180 Ramirez, Patricia Ann $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Patricia Ann: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6,206.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Ramirez, Patricia Ann; Garcia, Monica R.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Ramirez, Patricia Ann; Awarded Against:; Garcia, Monica R.; Amount; Damages: $4,821.50; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $120.12; Attorney Fees: $964.30; Costs: $275.63; Total: $6181.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF ALBERT W. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF GRACE ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Forward to Dept 404 on 08/27/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Monica R. Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Patricia Ann: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50368 Ramirez, Patricia Ann $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Patricia Ann: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Patricia Ann; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC is set for 10/31/19 in D402 at 3:30pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less