This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 19:17:48 (UTC).

Patricia Ann Ramirez vs. Brandon Pelley

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Patricia Ann Ramirez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Brandon Pelley. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Pebet, Noelle, Cabrera, Carlos and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6257

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Pebet, Noelle

Cabrera, Carlos

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Albert Ramirez Bail Bonds

Patricia Ann Ramirez

Defendants

Lopez, Vanessa

Vanessa Louisa Lopez

Daniel Paul Lopez

Pelley, Brandon

Lopez, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Albert W.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF GRACE ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF ALBERT W. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 9/9/2019

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 10/31/19 in Dept. 402 at 3:30 PM.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: See Scanned Order

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF ALBERT W. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Forward to Civil Examiner on 09/20/19.

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Previously defaulted.

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: See Scanned Order

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF GRACE ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Dismissal of Party: Brandon Pelley

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Patricia Ann Ramirez; Pelley, Brandon; Lopez, Daniel; Lopez, Vanessa; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Patricia Ann Ramirez; Awarded Against:; Lopez, Daniel; Lopez, Vanessa; Amount; Damages: $10,465.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $343.20; Attorney Fees: $1,819.75; Costs: $481.77; Total: $13109.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Original Type: Chambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF ALBERT W. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF GRACE ESPINOZA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Forward to: Dept 404 on 10/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Denied- Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Previously Defaulted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denied- Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: See Scanned Order

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Dismissal of Party: Brandon Pelley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Patricia Ann Ramirez: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-50384 Patricia Ann Ramirez $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Patricia Ann Ramirez: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Patricia Ann Ramirez; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 10/31/19 in Dept. 402 at 3:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less