This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 10:38:12 (UTC).

Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership vs. Cesar Avila

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cesar Avila. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4643

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership

Defendants

Avila, Cesar Mario

Gallardo, Yesinia Figueroa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Li, Laurie

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

07/12/2022: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

8/19/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

08/19/2022: 8/19/2022 - Writ of Possession Issued

9/26/2022 Return filed

09/26/2022: 9/26/2022 Return filed

08/15/22 Judgment - Restitution of Premises

08/12/2022: 08/15/22 Judgment - Restitution of Premises

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed Wholly Satisfied as to Possession Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-51416 Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Party; Names: Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership; Avila, Cesar Mario; Gallardo, Yesinia Figueroa; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To; Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership; Entitled to Possession of Premises at; 805 Avila Avenue #221 Parlier CA 93648; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against; Avila, Cesar Mario; Gallardo, Yesinia Figueroa; Comment: Copy mailed on 08/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Served: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Forward to: 404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default; Comment: Entered as to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Default Received; Comment: With Judgment in E-File

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-42917 Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership $385.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership: Transaction Assessment $385.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Parlier Avila Associates II, a California Limited Partnership; Total Financial Assessment $425.00; Total Payments and Credits $425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Notice of Restricted Access ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 07/15/22 ) . Parties served: ( Cesar Mario Avila; Yesinia Figueroa Gallardo; All Occupants )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: UDDI Dismissal set for 09/13/22 at 8:30am in Dept 404

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less