This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 20:37:42 (UTC).

PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. vs. Tarjinder Singh

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 PACCAR Financial Corp , a Washington corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tarjinder Singh. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brickey, Gabriel and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0387

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brickey, Gabriel

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.

Defendants

Singh, Tarjinder

Elite One Transport Inc., a Calif. corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Policar, Raymond A.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $91675.57

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract; Comment: Amount: $91,635.57

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.; Singh, Tarjinder; Elite One Transport Inc., a Calif. corp.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.; Awarded Against:; Singh, Tarjinder; Elite One Transport Inc., a Calif. corp.; Amount; Damages: $90,200.57; Attorney Fees: $1,000.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $91635.57

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Signed order forwarded to Clerks office 3/26/2021 Forwarded to RA on 3/24/2021

Statement filed

Brief; Comment: Brief Summary of The Case Pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1800

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Steve Selvar In Support of entry of Default Judgment

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/24/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Summons issued and filed

Summons for FILING.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

CCCS for FILING.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint for FILING.pdf

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Ray Policar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-24837 PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.: Transaction Assessment $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $91675.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract; Comment: Amount: $91,635.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.; Singh, Tarjinder; Elite One Transport Inc., a Calif. corp.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.; Awarded Against:; Singh, Tarjinder; Elite One Transport Inc., a Calif. corp.; Amount; Damages: $90,200.57; Attorney Fees: $1,000.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $91635.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- Judgment; Comment: Signed order forwarded to Clerks office 3/26/2021 Forwarded to RA on 3/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-07076 PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: PACCAR Financial Corp., a Washington corp.; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 6/24/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons for FILING.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- CCCS for FILING.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint for FILING.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACCAR FINANCIAL CORPORATION, A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR, RAYMOND A