This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 23:36:43 (UTC).

Ossanna Boghos Proudian (CONS/PE)

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Ossanna Boghos Proudian CONS/PE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kazanjian, Debra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0601

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kazanjian, Debra

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian

Ambriz, Emily

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Fashing, Peter G.

Torigian, Marcus A

Neilson, Bruce A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketClerk's Notice Filed- Comment: Re: Court Trial rescheduled to 8/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Conservatee's Death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Order Continuing Trial was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 1/23/2020. Parties served: Bruce A. Neilson (Attorney) Peter Fashing (Attorney) Deborah Boyett (Attorney) Heather Kruthers (Attorney) Fresno County Public Guardian (Conservator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder (Generic)- Judicial Officer: Kazanjian, Debra; Comment: Order Continuing Trial Date cc emailed/mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-05806 Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order- Comment: Stipulation to Continue Trial Date for 30 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketExparte Petition/Application (Generic)- Comment: Application for Order Dispensing with Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-49681 Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Kalamkarian, Hoori Santikian; Total Financial Assessment $1,110.50; Total Payments and Credits $1,110.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice Filed- Comment: Notice of Conservatee's Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDuties of Conservator- Comment: Duties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form- Comment: Confidential Conservator Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information- Comment: Confidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Initial)- Comment: Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of the Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.