This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 05:49:13 (UTC).

Ophelia Lee vs. Valen Lee

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Ophelia Lee filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Valen Lee. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1254

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lee, Ophelia

Lee, Annie

Defendants

Lee, Linette

Lee, Amber

Lee, Valen

The Estate of James Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pinion, G. Bryan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes; Comment: CMC set for 8/25/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Order Denied

03/15/2022: Order Denied

3/14/2022-Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

03/14/2022: 3/14/2022-Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

12/02/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Order Denied

10/13/2021: Order Denied

Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

10/01/2021: Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

08/25/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Order Denied

08/23/2021: Order Denied

Application

08/18/2021: Application

Case Management Statement

08/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Hearing

07/23/2021: Notice of Hearing

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

05/03/2021: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Summons

05/03/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

04/30/2021: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denied; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: application and order for Publication of Summons is Denied. Application for extension of time for service is Granted. The time is extended to 90 days. CMC currently set for 3-22-2022 is continued to 7-5-2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Ophelia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-16192 Lee, Ophelia $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Ophelia: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to: 502 Order for: Application and order for publication and extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denied; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: Application and order for Publication of Summons is DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Annie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-62420 Lee, Annie $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: ***Order signed and forwarded to clerk's office for processing 8-20-21*** Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: cASE mANAGEMENT sTATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Time Change

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Ophelia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-27277 Lee, Ophelia $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lee, Ophelia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Lee, Ophelia; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 8/25/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINION, G BRYAN