This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/14/2022 at 16:02:50 (UTC).

Nver Tadevosyan vs. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Nver Tadevosyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi and Negin, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1145

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tadevosyan, Nver

Tadevosyan, Lala

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilkins, James H.

Defendant Attorney

Boos, Nicholas J.

 

Court Documents

4/15/2022 Complaint

04/15/2022: 4/15/2022 Complaint

4/18/2022 Summons

04/18/2022: 4/18/2022 Summons

CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

04/18/2022: CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/18/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/18/2022: 4/18/2022-Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2022-Proof of Service

04/21/2022: 4/21/2022-Proof of Service

5/26/22 Answer

05/26/2022: 5/26/22 Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Safeco Insurance Company of America: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-32264 Safeco Insurance Company of America $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Safeco Insurance Company of America: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Safeco Insurance Company of America; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tadevosyan, Nver: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-23816 Tadevosyan, Nver $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tadevosyan, Nver: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: Tadevosyan, Nver; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes and Case Management Conference (email).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOS NICHOLAS JUSTIN