This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/22/2020 at 12:51:28 (UTC).

Nereydab Curiel vs. Bryan Arviso

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Nereydab Curiel filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Bryan Arviso. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1411

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curiel, Nereydab

Defendant

Arviso, Bryan

 

Court Documents

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Curiel, Nereydab; Awarded Against:; Arviso, Bryan; Amount; Damages: $2,000.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2090.00; Party Names: Curiel, Nereydab; Arviso, Bryan

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,321.20

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $184.50 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $21.70

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $2,090.00

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Curiel, Nereydab; Awarded Against:; Arviso, Bryan; Amount; Damages: $2,000.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $2090.00; Party Names: Curiel, Nereydab; Arviso, Bryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $184.50 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $21.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,321.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingAbstract of Judgment Issued- Abstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $2,090.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • HearingNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • HearingCourt Trial- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Curiel, Nereydab; Parties Present- Defendant: Arviso, Bryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingPlaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingCause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00011834 Curiel, Nereydab $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00011831 Curiel, Nereydab $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Transaction Assessment $0.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00011808 Curiel, Nereydab $1.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Transaction Assessment $1.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00007786 Curiel, Nereydab $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Transaction Assessment $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Curiel, Nereydab: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Curiel, Nereydab; Total Financial Assessment $106.80; Total Payments and Credits $106.80

    Read MoreRead Less