This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 18:15:04 (UTC).

Nathalia Cuadros Lopez vs Manuel de Jesus Gutierrez Pena

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Nathalia Cuadros Lopez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Manuel de Jesus Gutierrez Pena. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6588

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Nathalia Cuadros

Respondent

Gutierrez Pena, Manuel de Jesus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: Lopez, Nathalia Cuadros; Gutierrez Pena, Manuel de Jesus; Comment: Default Judgment/Marital status ends 05/19/20 Wife's former name restored to Nathalia Cuadros Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Default Judgment/marital status ends 05/19/20 Wife's former name restored to Nathalia Cuadros Lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Preliminary and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Comment: entered as to respondent Manuel de Jesus Gutierrez Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez, Nathalia Cuadros: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lopez, Nathalia Cuadros: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Lopez, Nathalia Cuadros; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.