This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/09/2020 at 17:34:26 (UTC).

Naica Cavazos vs Maria Ramirez-DePrado

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Naica Cavazos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Maria Ramirez-DePrado. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Tharpe, D Tyler and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0934

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

Ramirez-DePrado, Maria

Cavazos, Naica

Hodge, Keith M

Hodge, Amber L

Hodge, Amber L.

Hodge, Keith M.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Hodge, Amber L.

Hodge, Keith M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

Yates, M. Jacqueline

Mazzela, Timothy Wayne

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Czeshinski, Michael J.

Yates, M. Jacqueline

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Czeshinski, Michael J.

 

Court Documents

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit.

Case Management Statement Filed

2674561_231CMCStmt.p

Notice Filed

2674561_176Juryfees.; Comment: of Jury Fees

Answer Filed

2674561_976Answer.pd; Comment: to Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer Filed

2882545_133Answer.pd; Comment: to 1st Cross-Complaint

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

2850056_794ADRStip.p; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James A. Dilling

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: 1st Cross-Complaint

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint; Comment: 1st Cross Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Ramirez-DePrado, Maria; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties; Time est. 4-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: Forwarded to RA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- 3241811_614DePradoDi; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingNotice Filed- 3239543_316SignedNot; Comment: Notice of Settlement; Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingOrder Received for Signature- 3239543_889Signedpro; Comment: Forwarded to RA Proposed Order Approving Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingApplication Filed- 3239543_246SignedApp; Comment: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Dec of MJY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingAnswer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Hodge, Amber L: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Hodge, Amber L; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavazos, Naica: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-35687 Cavazos, Naica $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavazos, Naica: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavazos, Naica: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-21971 Cavazos, Naica $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavazos, Naica: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Cavazos, Naica; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez-DePrado, Maria: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-34228 Ramirez-DePrado, Maria $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez-DePrado, Maria: Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez-DePrado, Maria; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CZESHINSKI, MICHAEL J