This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 03:00:29 (UTC).

MVK Enterprises LLC vs. Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC,

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 MVK Enterprises LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC,. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Negin, Stephanie and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2146

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Negin, Stephanie

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MVK Enterprises LLC

a Nevada limited liability company

Gerwan, Dan

Defendants

Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC,

a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Whitney, Marshall C.

Defendant Attorney

Dearborn, Meredith R.

 

Court Documents

7/20/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/20/2022: 7/20/22 - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/222 Summons

07/19/2022: 7/19/222 Summons

7/20/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

07/20/2022: 7/20/22 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

7/15/22 Complaint

07/15/2022: 7/15/22 Complaint

Notice of Hearing

12/13/2022: Notice of Hearing

12/09/22 Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case

12/09/2022: 12/09/22 Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case

Minute Order Attachment

12/07/2022: Minute Order Attachment

11-29-22 Stipulation and Order for Stay of Defendant Date to Respond to Complaint

11/29/2022: 11-29-22 Stipulation and Order for Stay of Defendant Date to Respond to Complaint

11-23-22 [Proposed] Order on Joint Stipulation for Stay of Defendant Date to Respond

11/23/2022: 11-23-22 [Proposed] Order on Joint Stipulation for Stay of Defendant Date to Respond

11-21-22 Stipulation and Order for Further Extension of Time to Defendant to Respond to Complaint

11/21/2022: 11-21-22 Stipulation and Order for Further Extension of Time to Defendant to Respond to Complaint

11/18/22 - Stip and Order to Extend Time

11/18/2022: 11/18/22 - Stip and Order to Extend Time

11-7-22 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

11/07/2022: 11-7-22 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

11/4/22 - Stip and Order

11/04/2022: 11/4/22 - Stip and Order

10/31/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

10/31/2022: 10/31/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

10/28/22 Stipulation and Order filed

10/28/2022: 10/28/22 Stipulation and Order filed

10-26-22 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

10/26/2022: 10-26-22 (Proposed) Order on Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

10/26/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

10/26/2022: 10/26/22 - Order Regarding Remote Appearance Granted

Order Granted

10/25/2022: Order Granted

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Hearing set for 3/23/2023 at 3:30pm in Dept. 402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Reached; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 1/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC,: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-73779 Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC, $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wawona Delaware Holdings, LLC,: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Stipulation and Order for Stay of Defendant Date to Respond to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Appearance of Carter E. Greenbaum as Counsel of Record for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MVK Enterprises LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-44136 MVK Enterprises LLC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MVK Enterprises LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MVK Enterprises LLC; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MVK Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WAWONA DELAWARE HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where a Nevada Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant