This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/01/2023 at 01:10:01 (UTC).

Monique Smith vs. Lithia NF, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Monique Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lithia NF, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mangano, Robert and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0758

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mangano, Robert

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Monique

Defendants

Capital One N.A.

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Lithia NF, Inc.

Lithia Nissan of Fresno

Capital One Auto Finance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miser, John

Defendant Attorneys

Shao, Peng

McGreevy, Richard E.

 

Court Documents

02/28/23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/28/2023: 02/28/23 Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/28/23 Complaint

02/28/2023: 02/28/23 Complaint

02/28/23 Affidavit of John Miser in Support of CLRA Venue

02/28/2023: 02/28/23 Affidavit of John Miser in Support of CLRA Venue

03/02/23 Summons

03/02/2023: 03/02/23 Summons

03/02/23 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

03/02/2023: 03/02/23 CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

4/3/23 Answer

04/03/2023: 4/3/23 Answer

4/25/23 Capital's Answer

04/25/2023: 4/25/23 Capital's Answer

LithiaNF-CMCStmt.pdf

06/12/2023: LithiaNF-CMCStmt.pdf

LithiaNF-NotJuryFee.pdf

06/12/2023: LithiaNF-NotJuryFee.pdf

Case Management Statement

06/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

06/28/2023: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mangano, Robert; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lithia NF, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-39587 Lithia NF, Inc. $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lithia NF, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: DEFENDANTS LITHIA, NF, INC. D/B/A LITHIA NISSAN OF FRESNO AND TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICAS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: DEFENDANTS LITHIA, NF, INC. D/B/A LITHIA NISSAN OF FRESNO AND TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICAS CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital One Auto Finance: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-28187 Capital One Auto Finance $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Capital One Auto Finance: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Capital One Auto Finance; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Lithia NF, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Smith, Monique: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2023-14597 Smith, Monique $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Smith, Monique: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: Smith, Monique; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Comment: of John Miser in Support of CLRA Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less