This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:50:19 (UTC).

Moncerat Rodriguez Diaz vs. Samuel Delgado

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Moncerat Rodriguez Diaz filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Samuel Delgado. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGuire, Rosemary, Brickey, Gabriel, Negin, Stephanie and Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0530

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGuire, Rosemary

Brickey, Gabriel

Negin, Stephanie

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez Diaz, Moncerat

Defendants

Harris Farms, Inc.

Delgado, Samuel

Harris Ranch Beef Company

Cardenas Zamora, Diana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kalaf, Avraham

Defendant Attorneys

Crass, Steven M

Sanchez, Giulio A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

04/05/2022: Minute Order Attachment

cm110- Moncerat Diaz.pdf

04/05/2022: cm110- Moncerat Diaz.pdf

3/30/22 - Answer - Samuel

03/30/2022: 3/30/22 - Answer - Samuel

Case Management Statement

03/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

01/13/2022: Minute Order Attachment

1/5/22 Jury Fees

01/05/2022: 1/5/22 Jury Fees

CMC Statement- Moncerat Diaz v. Delgado.pdf

01/05/2022: CMC Statement- Moncerat Diaz v. Delgado.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

09/22/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement

09/07/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

07/01/2021: Minute Order Attachment

POS-civ-110.pdf

07/01/2021: POS-civ-110.pdf

Diaz v. Harris -CIV-110.pdf

07/01/2021: Diaz v. Harris -CIV-110.pdf

POS-clark hill.pdf

06/30/2021: POS-clark hill.pdf

POS-wjh.pdf

06/30/2021: POS-wjh.pdf

Diaz v. Harris -Dissmissal.pdf

06/30/2021: Diaz v. Harris -Dissmissal.pdf

Proof of Service

06/30/2021: Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

06/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Jury Deposit

06/16/2021: Notice of Jury Deposit

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Estimated 7-10 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Name: Cardenas Zamora, Diana; Comment: per CMC MO 4/5/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Requested by Both Parties; Comment: Estimated 7-10 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Negin, Stephanie; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Delgado, Samuel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2022-19687 Delgado, Samuel $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed; Comment: Summons to Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez Diaz, Moncerat: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-10234 Diaz, Moncerat Rodriguez $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rodriguez Diaz, Moncerat: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Rodriguez Diaz, Moncerat; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Document Filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 7/1/21 in Dept. 402 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less