This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 12:18:14 (UTC).

Mikeala Mercado vs. Samantha Avina

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Mikeala Mercado against Samantha Avina in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1417

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercado, Mikeala

Defendants

Avina, Alexandria

Avina, Samantha

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( FW-001 & FW-003 ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 7-11-2019 ) . Parties served: ( Plaintiff )

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Fee Waiver Denied

Fee Waiver Denied; Comment: You have $1,000.00 in your savings account to cover the fees.

Proof of Service

Subpoena filed; Comment: Subpoena filed

Fee Waiver Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Comment: **LDP: 7/15/2019** Please include information regarding all income (you state 'primary job-are there others?), please include all other adults in home and explain how you support self if operating at loss every month.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( FW-001 & FW-003 ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 7-01-2019 ) . Parties served: ( PLAINTIFF )

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Subpoena filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; SC-130A Notice of Entry of Judgment - Additional Parties; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Mercado, Mikeala; Avina, Samantha; Avina, Alexandria; Comment: dismiss with prejudice Statement of Decision: dismiss with prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with clerk's certificate of mailing

Defendant's Claim Filed

Defendant's Claim Filed

Judgment

Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Judgment Type: Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Party Name: Mercado, Mikeala; Comment: without prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; SC-130A Notice of Entry of Judgment - Additional Parties; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Mercado, Mikeala; Avina, Samantha; Avina, Alexandria; Comment: dismiss with prejudice Statement of Decision: dismiss with prejudice

Judgment

Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Judgment Type: Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Party Name: Mercado, Mikeala; Comment: without prejudice

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- SC-130 Notice of Entry of Judgment; SC-130A Notice of Entry of Judgment - Additional Parties; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Court orders action dismissed; Party Names: Mercado, Mikeala; Avina, Samantha; Avina, Alexandria; Comment: dismiss with prejudice Statement of Decision: dismiss with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Judgment Type: Voluntary Dismissal After Mediation; Party Name: Mercado, Mikeala; Comment: without prejudice as to defendant's claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Case Status Review- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims case referred to Mediation.- Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Mercado, Mikeala; Parties Present- Defendant: Avina, Samantha; Parties Present- Defendant: Avina, Alexandria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Defendant's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Financial info for Avina, Samantha: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009548 Avina, Samantha $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Financial info for Avina, Samantha: Transaction Assessment $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Financial info for Avina, Samantha: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00008102 Avina, Samantha $2.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Financial info for Avina, Samantha: Transaction Assessment $2.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Financial: Avina, Samantha; Total Financial Assessment $34.40; Total Payments and Credits $34.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Financial info for Mercado, Mikeala: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00008653 Mercado, Mikeala $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Financial info for Mercado, Mikeala: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Financial: Mercado, Mikeala; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less