This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/19/2022 at 01:36:55 (UTC).

Miguel Rocha vs. Solid Solutions 24/7, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Miguel Rocha filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Solid Solutions 24/7, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, McGuire, Rosemary, Gaab, Kimberly and Brickey, Gabriel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4508

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

McGuire, Rosemary

Gaab, Kimberly

Brickey, Gabriel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rocha, Miguel

Defendants

Solid Solutions 24/7, Inc.

DOE 1

Acosta, Santiago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fretwell, Jesse R.

Defendant Attorney

Vucinich, Jeffrey M.

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Amendment filed

Amendment filed; Comment: to substitute DOE 1 for Santiago Acosta

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Santiago Acosta. DEFECTIVE - person who signed did not include name or title on form. (not on POS-010 form)

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 05.15.2020** Forwarded to Dept 502 Ex Parte Amendment to Complaint to Name Doe

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: rescheduled hearing from 6/12/2020 to 9/11/2020 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 402

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: continued from 4/23/2020 to 6/12/2020 at 1:30 pm in Dept. 402

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Solid Solutions Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12-8-21 Request for Dismissal

12/08/2021: 12-8-21 Request for Dismissal

Consent to Confer filed

10/15/2021: Consent to Confer filed

Minute Order Attachment

10/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

10/15/2021: Minute Order Attachment

Motion (No Fee)

10/14/2021: Motion (No Fee)

List filed

10/14/2021: List filed

Notice

10/13/2021: Notice

Proposed Order

10/13/2021: Proposed Order

Motion (No Fee)

10/13/2021: Motion (No Fee)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 After Settlement; Judicial Officer: Brickey, Gabriel; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Rocha, Miguel; Solid Solutions 24/7, Inc.; Acosta, Santiago; Comment: with prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Estimated 4-7 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Confer filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: Settlement Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion filed; Comment: Motions in Limine I-V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 01/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: of Defendant, Solid Solutions 24/7, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rocha, Miguel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-99469 Rocha, Miguel $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Rocha, Miguel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Rocha, Miguel; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC set for 4/23/20 at 3:30pm. Assignment of Judge for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less