This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/17/2020 at 15:11:58 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Tarsha Griffin

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tarsha Griffin. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1511

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Griffin, Tarsha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jung, Hyo Jin Julia

 

Court Documents

Civil Complaint filed

Midland_18-207698_com_eABC.pdf

Civil case cover sheet

Midland_18-207698_ccs_eABC.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Midland_18-207698_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Judgment Received

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Forwarded to Civil Examiner on 3/12/2020

Proof of Service

POS_eABC_BatchEfileProofsOfServiceAndMailing_55740008.pdf

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

Midland_18-207698_rfe_eABC.pdf; Comment: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1

Declaration Filed

Declaration in Support; Comment: Exhibits in Support of Judgment

Request to Enter Default

Request for Entry of Default

Declaration Filed

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Comment: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Declaration Filed

Midland_18-207698_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue For Personal, Family or Household Obligations

Summons issued and filed

Midland_18-207698_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Request for Judical Notice

Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice; Comment: of the Legislative History of Civil Code 1788.50-1788.62 In Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judical Notice- Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice; Comment: of the Legislative History of Civil Code 1788.50-1788.62 In Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration in Support; Comment: Exhibits in Support of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes; Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Comment: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: Forwarded to Civil Examiner on 3/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSummons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- POS_eABC_BatchEfileProofsOfServiceAndMailing_55740008.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-91607 Midland Funding LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed- Midland_18-207698_rfe_eABC.pdf; Comment: Reduction in Filing Fee Pursuant to Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Midland_18-207698_ven_eABC.pdf; Comment: Pursuant to CCP Section 395 (b); Venue For Personal, Family or Household Obligations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Midland_18-207698_ccs_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Midland_18-207698_sum_eABC.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Midland_18-207698_com_eABC.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.